House
|
06/13/2022
|
Act 032, on 06/08/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1132).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2022
|
Act 032, 06/08/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1132).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2022
|
Enrolled to Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2022
|
Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 824).
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2022
|
Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 946).
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2022
|
Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with Representative(s) Wildberger voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2022
|
Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-03-22.
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 3-22) as amended in (CD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 3-22).
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2022
|
The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Branco, LoPresti; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Nakashima, McDermott.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Rhoads, Keith-Agaran, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2022
|
Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-22 1:30PM; Conference Room 016.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2022
|
Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-22-22 1:30PM; Conference Room 016.
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2022
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 884).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2022
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Inouye Chair; Rhoads Co-Chair; Keith-Agaran, Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2022
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 729).
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2022
|
House Conferees Appointed: Tarnas, Nakashima, Branco Co-Chairs; LoPresti, McDermott.
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2022
|
Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 742).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2022
|
Senate disagrees with House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2022
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 451).
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2022
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Costales, D. Kobayashi excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2022
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1784-22), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2022
|
The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Branco, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Todd; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Wildberger; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Eli, McDermott.
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-31-22 1:30PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Wildberger voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kitagawa, Kong excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1289-22), recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2022
|
The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka.
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Monday, 03-21-22 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2022
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2022
|
Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1032-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2022
|
The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Branco, Ganaden, B. Kobayashi, Kong, Morikawa, Ohno, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Tuesday, 03-15-22 8:30AM in House conference room 430 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Referred to WAL, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 24
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2022
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 14) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) Acasio, DeCoite). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2022
|
One Day Notice 02-04-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2022
|
Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2054) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2022
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Lee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2022
|
The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 01-28-22 9:30AM; Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
|
12/10/2021
|
Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2021
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2021
|
Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 124) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2021
|
The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Keith-Agaran, Misalucha, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2021
|
The committee(s) on WTL deferred the measure until 02-03-21 1:00PM in conference room 229.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2021
|
The committee(s) on WTL has rescheduled its public hearing to 01-29-21 1:00PM in conference room 229.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2021
|
The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 01-29-21 1:00PM; Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2021
|
Referred to WTL, JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2021
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2021
|
Introduced.
|
|
|