House
|
03/23/2022
|
The committee(s) on GVR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by GVR on Wednesday, 03-23-22 9:30AM in House conference room 309 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2022
|
This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Friday 03-18-22 10:00AM in conference room 309 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by GVR on Friday, 03-18-22 10:00AM in House conference room 309 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Referred to GVR, JHA, referral sheet 24
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 63).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) Ihara, Lee). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
One Day Notice 03-04-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2747) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2022
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-22-22 9:30AM; Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2022
|
Referred to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2022
|
Introduced and passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/14/2022
|
Pending Introduction.
|
|
|