Senate | 02/18/2022 | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/18/2022 | Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2611) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/14/2022 | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Acasio, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. | ||
Senate | 02/09/2022 | The committee(s) on AEN deferred the measure until 02-14-22 2:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 02/04/2022 | The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-22 1:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/21/2022 | Referred to AEN, WAM. | ||
Senate | 01/19/2022 | Introduced and passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/14/2022 | Pending Introduction. |