Hawaii 2022 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB206 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 21, 2021

Amended

Bill April 29, 2022
Bill March 18, 2022
Bill January 31, 2022
Bill February 8, 2021