Senate | 02/16/2022 | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC. | ||
Senate | 02/16/2022 | Reported from AEN/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2387) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC. | ||
Senate | 01/31/2022 | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Keith-Agaran, Misalucha; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Riviere ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Fevella; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
Senate | 01/31/2022 | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 2 No(es): Senator(s) Acasio, Fevella; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
Senate | 01/28/2022 | The committee(s) on AEN/WTL deferred the measure until 01-31-22 1:30PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/25/2022 | The committee(s) on AEN/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 01-28-22 2:00PM; CR 229 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/21/2022 | Referred to AEN/WTL, JDC. | ||
Senate | 01/19/2022 | Introduced and passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/18/2022 | Pending Introduction. |