Hawaii 2022 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB2076 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2022

Amended

Bill April 30, 2022
Bill April 8, 2022
Bill March 24, 2022
Bill March 17, 2022
Bill March 2, 2022
Bill January 31, 2022