House
|
03/10/2022
|
Referred to JHA, referral sheet 24
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 131) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Moriwaki, San Buenaventura. Noes, 3 (Senator(s) Fevella, Kim, Riviere). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2740) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2022
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Lee; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 2 No(es): Senator(s) Kim, Fevella; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2022
|
The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-18-22 9:30AM; Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2022
|
Referred to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2022
|
Introduced and passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2022
|
Pending Introduction.
|
|
|