House
|
06/17/2022
|
Act 085, on 06/17/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1185).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2022
|
Act 085, 06/17/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1185).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2022
|
Enrolled to Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2022
|
Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 824).
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2022
|
Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 946).
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2022
|
Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2022
|
Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-03-22.
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 28-22) as amended in (CD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 28-22).
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2022
|
The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Matayoshi, Clark, Ilagan, D. Kobayashi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2022
|
The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Rhoads, Inouye, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-26-22 10:00AM; Conference Room 329.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2022
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 729).
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2022
|
House Conferees Appointed: Aquino, Matayoshi Co-Chairs; Clark, Ilagan, D. Kobayashi, Matsumoto.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2022
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 873).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2022
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Lee Chair; Rhoads Co-Chair; Inouye, Fevella.
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2022
|
Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 871).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2022
|
Senate disagrees with House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2022
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 603).
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2022
|
Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2022
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-12-22.
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2022
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1916-22) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2022
|
The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 03-29-22 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kitagawa, Kong excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1227-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2022
|
The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Clark, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, Nakamura, Takumi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ilagan, LoPresti.
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Friday, 03-18-22 10:30AM in House conference room 423 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Referred to TRN, JHA, referral sheet 24
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 134) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2950) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2022
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Keohokalole.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-25-22 9:45AM; Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2022
|
Reported from TRS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2363) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2022
|
The committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TRS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Inouye, DeCoite, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2022
|
The committee(s) on TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-22 3:00PM; Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2022
|
Referred to TRS, JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2022
|
Introduced and passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2022
|
Pending Introduction.
|
|
|