House
|
03/10/2022
|
Referred to HHH, JHA, referral sheet 24
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 66).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) Ihara, Lee). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2832) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2022
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Keohokalole.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-25-22 9:45AM; Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
Reported from TRS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2398) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2022
|
The committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TRS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Inouye, DeCoite, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2022
|
The committee(s) on TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-22 3:00PM; Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2022
|
Referred to TRS, JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2022
|
Introduced and passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2022
|
Pending Introduction.
|
|
|