LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Hawaii HI
Legislatures
2022 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB2139
Action History
HI
Hawaii Senate Bill SB2139
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Hawaii 2022 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB2139
Action History
Senate
01/27/2022
The committee on GVO deferred the measure.
Senate
01/24/2022
The committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 01-27-22 3:00PM; CR 016 & Videoconference.
Senate
01/21/2022
Referred to GVO, WAM.
Senate
01/19/2022
Introduced and passed First Reading.
Senate
01/18/2022
Pending Introduction.