House
|
03/24/2022
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2022
|
Reported from GVR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1449-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
The committees on GVR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Wildberger, Costales, Eli, Ichiyama, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Mizuno, Woodson.
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by GVR on Wednesday, 03-23-22 9:30AM in House conference room 309 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2022
|
This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Friday 03-18-22 10:00AM in conference room 309 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by GVR on Friday, 03-18-22 10:00AM in House conference room 309 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Referred to GVR, JHA, referral sheet 24
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 140) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Reported from JDC/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3195) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Misalucha, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2022
|
The committee(s) on JDC/WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-02-22 9:30AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2022
|
Reported from GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2656) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2022
|
The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Moriwaki, Dela Cruz, Chang, Gabbard, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2022
|
The committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-15-22 3:10PM; Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2022
|
Referred to GVO, JDC/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2022
|
Introduced and passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2022
|
Pending Introduction.
|
|
|