House
|
03/22/2022
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2022
|
Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1220-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2022
|
The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Har, Hashem, Mizuno, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Kong; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 03-16-22 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Referred to CPC, JHA, referral sheet 24
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 144) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2939) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Lee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2022
|
The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-28-22 10:30AM; Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2022
|
Reported from HTH/GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2558) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2022
|
The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Moriwaki, Dela Cruz, Chang; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2022
|
The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Moriwaki; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, San Buenaventura.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
The committee(s) on HTH/GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-22 3:00PM; Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2022
|
Referred to HTH/GVO, JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2022
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2022
|
Introduced.
|
|
|