House
|
03/24/2022
|
Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2022
|
Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1357-22), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2022
|
The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakamura, Hashimoto, Aquino, Ilagan, Kitagawa, Takumi; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Clark, LoPresti, McDermott.
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Tuesday, 03-22-22 10:00AM in House conference room 423 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Referred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 24
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 147) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2965) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Misalucha, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani, Taniguchi, Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2022
|
The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 03-03-22 10:00AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2022
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-22-22 10:10AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2022
|
The committee on WAM deferred the measure.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2022
|
The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-22 10:00AM; CR 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2022
|
Referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2022
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2022
|
Introduced.
|
|
|