Senate | 02/15/2022 | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/15/2022 | Reported from EET/GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2345) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/09/2022 | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Moriwaki, Dela Cruz, Gabbard, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Chang. | ||
Senate | 02/09/2022 | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Misalucha, Lee, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
Senate | 02/04/2022 | The committee(s) on EET/GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-22 3:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/21/2022 | Referred to EET/GVO, WAM. | ||
Senate | 01/20/2022 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/20/2022 | Introduced. |