Senate | 02/23/2022 | The committee on CPN deferred the measure. | ||
Senate | 02/18/2022 | The committee(s) on CPN will hold a public decision making on 02-23-22 9:30AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 02/10/2022 | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN. | ||
Senate | 02/10/2022 | Reported from EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2203) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN. | ||
Senate | 01/31/2022 | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Misalucha, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Lee. | ||
Senate | 01/27/2022 | The committee(s) on EET has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-22 3:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/21/2022 | Referred to EET, CPN. | ||
Senate | 01/20/2022 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/20/2022 | Introduced. |