Senate
|
03/21/2022
|
Notice of bill proposing constitutional amendment transmitted to Governor pursuant to Article XVII, Section 3 (Sen. Com. No. 2).
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 24
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 151) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Riviere). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3008) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2022
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Misalucha, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2022
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-18-22 10:00AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2022
|
Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2107) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2022
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Acasio.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2022
|
The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-22 9:30AM; Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2022
|
Referred to JDC, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2022
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2022
|
Introduced.
|
|
|