Hawaii 2022 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB2185 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 20, 2022

Amended

Bill April 30, 2022
Bill March 21, 2022
Bill March 8, 2022
Bill March 4, 2022
Bill February 16, 2022