House
|
03/10/2022
|
Referred to HHH/CPC, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 24
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 158) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2808) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Chang, DeCoite, Nishihara, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) San Buenaventura.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2022
|
The committee(s) on CPN will hold a public decision making on 02-23-22 9:30AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
Reported from EDU/HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2426) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2022
|
The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Baker, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Moriwaki.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2022
|
The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Dela Cruz, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kim.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2022
|
The committee(s) on EDU/HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-22 3:30PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2022
|
Referred to EDU/HTH, CPN.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2022
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2022
|
Introduced.
|
|
|