12/10/2021 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |||
Senate | 02/12/2021 | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM/JDC. | ||
Senate | 02/12/2021 | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 187) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM/JDC. | ||
Senate | 02/09/2021 | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Chang, Misalucha, Nishihara, Riviere, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
Senate | 02/04/2021 | The committee(s) on CPN deferred the measure until 02-09-21 10:30AM in conference room 229. | ||
Senate | 01/28/2021 | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-21 9:30AM in conference room 229. | ||
Senate | 01/25/2021 | Referred to CPN, WAM/JDC. | ||
Senate | 01/22/2021 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/22/2021 | Introduced. |