Senate | 02/18/2022 | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/18/2022 | Reported from HOU/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2575) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/10/2022 | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Keith-Agaran, Misalucha; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Riviere, Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
Senate | 02/10/2022 | The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chang, Kanuha, Moriwaki, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | The committee(s) on HOU/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-22 1:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/24/2022 | Referred to HOU/WTL, WAM . | ||
Senate | 01/21/2022 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/21/2022 | Introduced. |