House
|
03/10/2022
|
Referred to HHH/CPC, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 24
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 179) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 3 (Senator(s) Fevella, Gabbard, Riviere). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Notice of reconsideration of previous vote taken on Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 21; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 4 (Senator(s) DeCoite, Fevella, Gabbard, Riviere). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
One Day Notice 03-08-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Reported from CPN/JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2985) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Chang, DeCoite, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Fevella; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Riviere.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Kim, Lee; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 2 No(es): Senator(s) Gabbard, Fevella; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2022
|
The committee(s) on CPN/JDC will hold a public decision making on 03-01-22 10:00AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN/JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2022
|
Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2487) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN/JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2022
|
The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Baker, Moriwaki, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Fevella; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2022
|
The committee(s) on HTH deferred the measure until 02-11-22 1:30PM; Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2022
|
The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-22 1:35PM; Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2022
|
Referred to HTH, CPN/JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2022
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2022
|
Introduced.
|
|
|