Senate | 02/11/2022 | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/11/2022 | Reported from EET/AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2238) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/02/2022 | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Acasio, Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
Senate | 02/02/2022 | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EET were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Misalucha, Lee, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
Senate | 01/28/2022 | The committee(s) on EET/AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-22 3:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/24/2022 | Referred to EET/AEN, WAM . | ||
Senate | 01/21/2022 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/21/2022 | Introduced. |