House
|
06/27/2022
|
Act 156, on 06/27/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1257).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2022
|
Act 156, 06/27/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1257).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2022
|
Enrolled to Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2022
|
Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 824).
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2022
|
Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 946).
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2022
|
Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with Representative(s) McKelvey voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kong, McDermott, Okimoto voting no (3) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2022
|
Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2022
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-03-22.
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2022
|
Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 252-22) as amended in (CD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2022
|
48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2022
|
Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 252-22).
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2022
|
The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Kitagawa, Marten, Tam; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Matsumoto; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2022
|
The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Baker, Acasio; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-29-22 10:10AM in conference room 325.
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday, 04-28-22 at 6:00PM in Conference Room 325.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2022
|
Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-28-22 9:30AM in conference room 325.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2022
|
Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-27-22 5:00PM in conference room 325.
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2022
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 890).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2022
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Gabbard Chair; Baker Co-Chair; Acasio, Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2022
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 729).
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2022
|
House Conferees Appointed: Lowen, Kitagawa, Marten Co-Chairs; Tam, Matsumoto.
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2022
|
Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 871).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2022
|
Senate disagrees with House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2022
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 614).
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2022
|
Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Tokioka, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Har, Kong, McDermott, Okimoto voting no (4) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2022
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1960-22), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2022
|
The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Todd, Wildberger, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 04-06-22 1:30PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2022
|
Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with Representative(s) Har, Kong, Matsumoto, Okimoto, Tokioka voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) Ohno excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2022
|
Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1415-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2022
|
The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Hashem, Mizuno, Onishi, Tarnas; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Har, Kong, Morikawa, Matsumoto; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 03-21-22 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2022
|
Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Matsumoto, Okimoto, Tokioka voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2022
|
Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1054-22), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2022
|
The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Marten, Hashem, Perruso, Todd; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Tokioka, Matsumoto; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Matayoshi.
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 03-15-22 9:00AM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Referred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 24
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 183) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Reported from CPN/JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2979) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Chang, DeCoite, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Riviere.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2022
|
The committee(s) on CPN/JDC will hold a public decision making on 03-01-22 10:00AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to CPN/JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2022
|
Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2612) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to CPN/JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2022
|
The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Acasio, Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2022
|
The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-22 1:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2022
|
Referred to AEN, CPN/JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2022
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2022
|
Introduced.
|
|
|