Senate | 02/18/2022 | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/18/2022 | Reported from GVO/TRS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2697) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/15/2022 | Re-Referred to GVO/TRS, JDC/WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/10/2022 | The committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Inouye, DeCoite, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
Senate | 02/10/2022 | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Moriwaki, Dela Cruz, Chang, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard. | ||
Senate | 02/08/2022 | The committee(s) on GVO/TRS deferred the measure until 02-10-22 3:15PM; Via Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 02/04/2022 | The committee(s) on GVO/TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-22 3:15PM; Via Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/24/2022 | Referred to GVO/TRS, JDC. | ||
Senate | 01/21/2022 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/21/2022 | Introduced. |