House
|
03/23/2022
|
Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) Kitagawa, Kong excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1297-22), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2022
|
The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Marten, Hashem, Perruso, Tokioka, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Todd.
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 03-22-22 9:30AM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Referred to EEP, JHA, referral sheet 24
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 186) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Acasio, Riviere. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2942) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Gabbard, Kim, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Acasio ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Lee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2022
|
The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-28-22 10:30AM; Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2022
|
Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2392) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2022
|
The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Acasio ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2022
|
The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-22 1:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2022
|
Referred to AEN, JDC .
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2022
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2022
|
Introduced.
|
|
|