House
|
03/18/2022
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Branco, Ilagan, McKelvey, Ohno excused (4).
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2022
|
Reported from ECD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1086-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2022
|
The committees on ECD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Quinlan, Holt, Belatti, D. Kobayashi, Onishi, Sayama, Takayama; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Okimoto.
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by ECD on Wednesday, 03-16-22 10:00AM in House conference room 312 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Referred to ECD, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 24
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 71).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) Ihara, Lee). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
One Day Notice 03-04-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2736) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2022
|
The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-17-22 9:30AM; Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2022
|
Referred to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2022
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2022
|
Introduced.
|
|
|