Senate | 02/16/2022 | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/16/2022 | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2370) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/14/2022 | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz. | ||
Senate | 02/11/2022 | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-14-22 3:15PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/24/2022 | Referred to EDU, WAM. | ||
Senate | 01/21/2022 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/21/2022 | Introduced. |