Senate | 02/17/2022 | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/17/2022 | Reported from LCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2459) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | The committee(s) on LCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LCA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Ihara, Chang, Keohokalole, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
Senate | 02/04/2022 | The committee(s) on LCA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-22 3:10PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/24/2022 | Referred to LCA, JDC/WAM. | ||
Senate | 01/21/2022 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/21/2022 | Introduced. |