Hawaii 2022 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB2357 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-THE SENATE S.B. NO. 2357 THIRTY-FIRST LEGISLATURE, 2022 S.D. 1 STATE OF HAWAII A BILL FOR AN ACT RELATING TO THE ISSUANCE OF SPECIAL PURPOSE REVENUE BONDS TO ASSIST MAUIGROWN COFFEE, INC. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF HAWAII:
1+THE SENATE S.B. NO. 2357 THIRTY-FIRST LEGISLATURE, 2022 STATE OF HAWAII A BILL FOR AN ACT RELATING TO THE ISSUANCE OF SPECIAL PURPOSE REVENUE BONDS TO ASSIST MAUIGROWN COFFEE, INC. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF HAWAII:
22
33 THE SENATE S.B. NO. 2357
4-THIRTY-FIRST LEGISLATURE, 2022 S.D. 1
4+THIRTY-FIRST LEGISLATURE, 2022
55 STATE OF HAWAII
66
77 THE SENATE
88
99 S.B. NO.
1010
1111 2357
1212
1313 THIRTY-FIRST LEGISLATURE, 2022
1414
15-S.D. 1
15+
1616
1717 STATE OF HAWAII
1818
1919
2020
2121
2222
2323
2424
2525
2626
2727
2828
2929
3030
3131 A BILL FOR AN ACT
3232
3333
3434
3535
3636
3737 RELATING TO THE ISSUANCE OF SPECIAL PURPOSE REVENUE BONDS TO ASSIST MAUIGROWN COFFEE, INC.
3838
3939
4040
4141
4242
4343 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF HAWAII:
4444
4545
4646
47- SECTION 1. The legislature finds that Act 116, Session Laws of Hawaii 2017, authorized the issuance of special purpose revenue bonds to assist MauiGrown Coffee, Inc., a Hawaii corporation, to expand the operation of its coffee farm and mill in Puukolii, Maui. The authorization to issue special purpose revenue bonds is set to lapse on June 30, 2022. The purpose of this Act is to extend the authorization to issue special purpose revenue bonds to assist MauiGrown Coffee, Inc., pursuant to Act 116, Session Laws of Hawaii 2017, until June 30, 2027. SECTION 2. Act 116, Session Laws of Hawaii 2017, is amended by amending sections 4 and 5 to read as follows: "SECTION 4. The department of budget and finance is authorized, from time to time, including times subsequent to June 30, [2022,] 2027, to issue special purpose revenue bonds in whatever principal amounts the department shall determine to be necessary to refund the special purpose revenue bonds authorized in section 2 and to refund special purpose revenue bonds authorized in this section, regardless of whether the outstanding special purpose revenue bonds or refunding special purpose revenue bonds have matured or are the subject of redemption or whether the refunding special purpose revenue bonds shall be bonds for the multi-project programs described in section 2. In making this determination, the department shall comply with federal law relating to the exemption from federal income taxation of the interest on bonds of the nature authorized by this section. SECTION 5. The authorization to issue special purpose revenue bonds under this Act shall lapse on June 30, [2022.] 2027." SECTION 3. Statutory material to be repealed is bracketed and stricken. New statutory material is underscored. SECTION 4. This Act shall take effect on June 29, 2050.
47+ SECTION 1. The legislature finds that Act 116, Session Laws of Hawaii 2017, authorized the issuance of special purpose revenue bonds to assist MauiGrown Coffee, Inc., a Hawaii corporation, with the expanded operation of its coffee farm and mill in Puukolii, Maui. The authorization to issue special purpose revenue bonds is set to lapse on June 30, 2022. The purpose of this Act is to extend the authorization to issue special purpose revenue bonds to assist MauiGrown Coffee, Inc., pursuant to Act 116, Session Laws of Hawaii 2017, until June 30, 2027. SECTION 2. Act 116, Session Laws of Hawaii 2017, is amended by amending sections 4 and 5 to read as follows: "SECTION 4. The department of budget and finance is authorized, from time to time, including times subsequent to June 30, [2022,] 2027, to issue special purpose revenue bonds in whatever principal amounts the department shall determine to be necessary to refund the special purpose revenue bonds authorized in section 2 and to refund special purpose revenue bonds authorized in this section, regardless of whether the outstanding special purpose revenue bonds or refunding special purpose revenue bonds have matured or are the subject of redemption or whether the refunding special purpose revenue bonds shall be bonds for the multi-project programs described in section 2. In making this determination, the department shall comply with federal law relating to the exemption from federal income taxation of the interest on bonds of the nature authorized by this section. SECTION 5. The authorization to issue special purpose revenue bonds under this Act shall lapse on June 30, [2022.] 2027." SECTION 3. Statutory material to be repealed is bracketed and stricken. New statutory material is underscored. SECTION 4. This Act shall take effect on July 1, 2022. INTRODUCED BY: _____________________________
4848
49- SECTION 1. The legislature finds that Act 116, Session Laws of Hawaii 2017, authorized the issuance of special purpose revenue bonds to assist MauiGrown Coffee, Inc., a Hawaii corporation, to expand the operation of its coffee farm and mill in Puukolii, Maui. The authorization to issue special purpose revenue bonds is set to lapse on June 30, 2022.
49+ SECTION 1. The legislature finds that Act 116, Session Laws of Hawaii 2017, authorized the issuance of special purpose revenue bonds to assist MauiGrown Coffee, Inc., a Hawaii corporation, with the expanded operation of its coffee farm and mill in Puukolii, Maui. The authorization to issue special purpose revenue bonds is set to lapse on June 30, 2022.
5050
5151 The purpose of this Act is to extend the authorization to issue special purpose revenue bonds to assist MauiGrown Coffee, Inc., pursuant to Act 116, Session Laws of Hawaii 2017, until June 30, 2027.
5252
5353 SECTION 2. Act 116, Session Laws of Hawaii 2017, is amended by amending sections 4 and 5 to read as follows:
5454
5555 "SECTION 4. The department of budget and finance is authorized, from time to time, including times subsequent to June 30, [2022,] 2027, to issue special purpose revenue bonds in whatever principal amounts the department shall determine to be necessary to refund the special purpose revenue bonds authorized in section 2 and to refund special purpose revenue bonds authorized in this section, regardless of whether the outstanding special purpose revenue bonds or refunding special purpose revenue bonds have matured or are the subject of redemption or whether the refunding special purpose revenue bonds shall be bonds for the multi-project programs described in section 2. In making this determination, the department shall comply with federal law relating to the exemption from federal income taxation of the interest on bonds of the nature authorized by this section.
5656
5757 SECTION 5. The authorization to issue special purpose revenue bonds under this Act shall lapse on June 30, [2022.] 2027."
5858
5959 SECTION 3. Statutory material to be repealed is bracketed and stricken. New statutory material is underscored.
6060
61- SECTION 4. This Act shall take effect on June 29, 2050.
61+ SECTION 4. This Act shall take effect on July 1, 2022.
6262
63- Report Title: Special Purpose Revenue Bonds; Maui; MauiGrown Coffee, Inc. Description: Extends the authorization to issue special purpose revenue bonds to assist MauiGrown Coffee, Inc., with the operation and expansion of its farm and mill. Effective 6/29/2050. (SD1) The summary description of legislation appearing on this page is for informational purposes only and is not legislation or evidence of legislative intent.
63+
64+
65+INTRODUCED BY: _____________________________
66+
67+INTRODUCED BY:
68+
69+_____________________________
70+
71+
72+
73+
74+
75+
76+
77+
78+
79+
80+
81+
82+
83+
84+
85+
86+
87+ Report Title: Special Purpose Revenue Bonds; Maui; MauiGrown Coffee, Inc. Description: Extends the authorization to issue special purpose revenue bonds to assist MauiGrown Coffee, Inc., with the operation and expansion of its farm and mill. The summary description of legislation appearing on this page is for informational purposes only and is not legislation or evidence of legislative intent.
6488
6589
6690
6791
6892
6993 Report Title:
7094
7195 Special Purpose Revenue Bonds; Maui; MauiGrown Coffee, Inc.
7296
7397
7498
7599 Description:
76100
77-Extends the authorization to issue special purpose revenue bonds to assist MauiGrown Coffee, Inc., with the operation and expansion of its farm and mill. Effective 6/29/2050. (SD1)
101+Extends the authorization to issue special purpose revenue bonds to assist MauiGrown Coffee, Inc., with the operation and expansion of its farm and mill.
78102
79103
80104
81105
82106
83107
84108
85109 The summary description of legislation appearing on this page is for informational purposes only and is not legislation or evidence of legislative intent.