Hawaii 2022 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB2372 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 21, 2022

Amended

Bill April 8, 2022
Bill March 23, 2022
Bill March 5, 2022
Bill February 16, 2022