Senate
|
04/20/2022
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 729).
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2022
|
House Conferees Appointed: Ohno, Yamane, B. Kobayashi Co-Chairs; Ganaden, McDermott.
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2022
|
Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 742).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2022
|
Senate disagrees with House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2022
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 467).
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2022
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Costales, D. Kobayashi, Lowen excused (3). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2022
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1829-22), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2022
|
The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Todd, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Branco, McDermott.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 04-04-22 2:30PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2022
|
Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2022
|
Reported from HHH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1374-22), recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2022
|
The committees on HHH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Tam, Gates, Har, Kapela, Nishimoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HHH on Tuesday, 03-22-22 9:30AM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2022
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on HHH with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Branco, Ilagan, McKelvey, Ohno excused (4).
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2022
|
Reported from CMV (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1103-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to HHH.
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2022
|
The committees on CMV recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Ohno, Ganaden, Branco, B. Kobayashi, Kong, Tarnas; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Morikawa, McDermott.
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CMV on Wednesday, 03-16-22 10:00AM in House conference room 430 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Referred to CMV, HHH, FIN, referral sheet 24
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 202) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2930) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2022
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Misalucha, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2022
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-22-22 10:00AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2080) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2022
|
The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, DeCoite, Baker, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2022
|
The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-22 1:00PM; Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2022
|
Referred to PSM, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2022
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2022
|
Introduced.
|
|
|