House
|
04/06/2022
|
The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 04-06-22 2:45PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2022
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Kapela, Perruso voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2022
|
Reported from ECD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1203-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2022
|
The committees on ECD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Quinlan, Holt, Belatti, D. Kobayashi, Onishi, Sayama, Takayama, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by ECD on Friday, 03-18-22 10:30AM in House conference room 312 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Referred to ECD, FIN, referral sheet 24
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 204) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2866) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2022
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Misalucha, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2022
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-18-22 10:00AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2022
|
Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2108) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2022
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Gabbard, Kim, Lee; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Acasio.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2022
|
The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-22 9:30AM; Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2022
|
Referred to JDC, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2022
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2022
|
Introduced.
|
|
|