Hawaii 2022 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB2385 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 21, 2022

Amended

Bill March 24, 2022
Bill March 18, 2022
Bill March 3, 2022
Bill February 8, 2022