Hawaii 2022 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB2419 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-THE SENATE S.B. NO. 2419 THIRTY-FIRST LEGISLATURE, 2022 S.D. 1 STATE OF HAWAII A BILL FOR AN ACT RELATING TO TRANSIENT ACCOMMODATIONS HOSTING PLATFORMS. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF HAWAII:
1+THE SENATE S.B. NO. 2419 THIRTY-FIRST LEGISLATURE, 2022 STATE OF HAWAII A BILL FOR AN ACT RELATING TO TRANSIENT ACCOMMODATIONS HOSTING PLATFORMS. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF HAWAII:
22
33 THE SENATE S.B. NO. 2419
4-THIRTY-FIRST LEGISLATURE, 2022 S.D. 1
4+THIRTY-FIRST LEGISLATURE, 2022
55 STATE OF HAWAII
66
77 THE SENATE
88
99 S.B. NO.
1010
1111 2419
1212
1313 THIRTY-FIRST LEGISLATURE, 2022
1414
15-S.D. 1
15+
1616
1717 STATE OF HAWAII
1818
1919
2020
2121
2222
2323
2424
2525
2626
2727
2828
2929
3030
3131 A BILL FOR AN ACT
3232
3333
3434
3535
3636
3737 RELATING TO TRANSIENT ACCOMMODATIONS HOSTING PLATFORMS.
3838
3939
4040
4141
4242
4343 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF HAWAII:
4444
4545
4646
47- SECTION 1. No later than January 1, 2023, each county with a population of 200,000 or less shall establish a five-year pilot project to regulate the operation of hosting platforms that provide booking services for transient accommodation operators conducting business within those counties. For the purposes of this Act: (1) "Booking service" means any reservation or payment service provided by a person who facilitates a transient accommodations transaction between a prospective transient user and a host; and (2) "Hosting platform" means a person who participates in the transient accommodations business by collecting or receiving a fee, directly or indirectly through an agent or intermediary, for conducting a booking service transaction using any medium of facilitation. SECTION 2. Each county with a population of 200,000 or less shall submit a report of its findings and recommendations, including any proposed legislation, regarding the regulation of hosting platforms that provide booking services for transient accommodation operators to the legislature no later than twenty days prior to the convening of the regular session of 2028. SECTION 3. This Act shall take effect on July 1, 2050, and shall repeal on June 30, 2028.
47+ SECTION 1. No later than January 1, 2023, each county with a population of 200,000 or less shall establish a five-year pilot project to regulate the operation of hosting platforms that provide booking services for transient accommodation operators conducting business within those counties. For the purposes of this Act: (1) "Booking service" means any reservation or payment service provided by a person who facilitates a transient accommodations transaction between a prospective transient user and a host; and (2) "Hosting platform" means a person who participates in the transient accommodations business by collecting or receiving a fee, directly or indirectly through an agent or intermediary, for conducting a booking service transaction using any medium of facilitation. SECTION 2. Each county with a population of 200,000 or less shall submit a report of its findings and recommendations, including any proposed legislation, regarding the regulation of hosting platforms that provide booking services for transient accommodation operators to the legislature no later than twenty days prior to the convening of the regular session of 2028. SECTION 3. This Act shall take effect on July 1, 2022, and shall repeal on June 30, 2028. INTRODUCED BY: _____________________________
4848
4949 SECTION 1. No later than January 1, 2023, each county with a population of 200,000 or less shall establish a five-year pilot project to regulate the operation of hosting platforms that provide booking services for transient accommodation operators conducting business within those counties. For the purposes of this Act:
5050
5151 (1) "Booking service" means any reservation or payment service provided by a person who facilitates a transient accommodations transaction between a prospective transient user and a host; and
5252
5353 (2) "Hosting platform" means a person who participates in the transient accommodations business by collecting or receiving a fee, directly or indirectly through an agent or intermediary, for conducting a booking service transaction using any medium of facilitation.
5454
5555 SECTION 2. Each county with a population of 200,000 or less shall submit a report of its findings and recommendations, including any proposed legislation, regarding the regulation of hosting platforms that provide booking services for transient accommodation operators to the legislature no later than twenty days prior to the convening of the regular session of 2028.
5656
57- SECTION 3. This Act shall take effect on July 1, 2050, and shall repeal on June 30, 2028.
57+ SECTION 3. This Act shall take effect on July 1, 2022, and shall repeal on June 30, 2028.
5858
59- Report Title: Transient Accommodations; Booking Services; Hosting Platforms; County Regulation; Pilot Project Description: Creates a five-year pilot project for counties with a population less than 200,000 to regulate the operation of hosting platforms that provide booking services for transient accommodation operators. Requires a report to the Legislature. Effective 7/1/2050. Repeals on 6/30/2028. (SD1) The summary description of legislation appearing on this page is for informational purposes only and is not legislation or evidence of legislative intent.
59+
60+
61+INTRODUCED BY: _____________________________
62+
63+INTRODUCED BY:
64+
65+_____________________________
66+
67+
68+
69+
70+
71+ Report Title: Transient Accommodations; Booking Services; Hosting Platforms; County Regulation; Pilot Project Description: Creates a five-year pilot project for counties with a population less than 200,000 to regulate the operation of hosting platforms that provide booking services for transient accommodation operators. Requires a report to the Legislature. Repeals on 6/30/2028. The summary description of legislation appearing on this page is for informational purposes only and is not legislation or evidence of legislative intent.
6072
6173
6274
6375
6476
6577 Report Title:
6678
6779 Transient Accommodations; Booking Services; Hosting Platforms; County Regulation; Pilot Project
6880
6981
7082
7183 Description:
7284
73-Creates a five-year pilot project for counties with a population less than 200,000 to regulate the operation of hosting platforms that provide booking services for transient accommodation operators. Requires a report to the Legislature. Effective 7/1/2050. Repeals on 6/30/2028. (SD1)
85+Creates a five-year pilot project for counties with a population less than 200,000 to regulate the operation of hosting platforms that provide booking services for transient accommodation operators. Requires a report to the Legislature. Repeals on 6/30/2028.
7486
7587
7688
7789
7890
7991
8092
8193 The summary description of legislation appearing on this page is for informational purposes only and is not legislation or evidence of legislative intent.