|
12/10/2021
|
Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2021
|
Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2021
|
Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1487) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2021
|
The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Har, Hashem, Kong, Mizuno, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 03-24-21 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2021
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2021
|
Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1011) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2021
|
The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Marten, Hashem, Perruso, Todd, Tokioka, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Matayoshi.
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 03-16-21 9:00AM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
Referred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 22
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 177) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Acasio, Fevella. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2021
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-09-21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2021
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 946) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2021
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2021
|
The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 03-02-21 10:05AM; CR 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2021
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-26-21 9:30AM; CR 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2021
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2021
|
Reported from EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 173) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2021
|
The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Misalucha, Lee, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2021
|
The committee(s) on EET has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-21 3:00PM in conference room 224.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2021
|
Referred to EET, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2021
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2021
|
Introduced.
|
|
|