Senate | 02/18/2022 | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN/JDC. | ||
Senate | 02/18/2022 | Reported from HTH/HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2501) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN/JDC. | ||
Senate | 02/10/2022 | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Baker, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Moriwaki, Fevella. | ||
Senate | 02/10/2022 | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Ihara, Acasio, Misalucha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. | ||
Senate | 02/04/2022 | The committee(s) on HTH/HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-22 3:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/24/2022 | Referred to HTH/HMS, CPN/JDC. | ||
Senate | 01/24/2022 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/21/2022 | Introduced. |