|
12/10/2021
|
Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2021
|
Received notice of discharge of all conferees (Hse. Com. No. 627).
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2021
|
House Conferee(s) discharged.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2021
|
Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-22-21 5:00PM; CR 016.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-22-21 10:30AM; CR 016.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-21-21 10:10AM; CR 016.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 559).
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2021
|
House Conferees Appointed: McKelvey, Ichiyama, Johanson, Luke Co-Chairs; Ward.
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2021
|
Re-referred to GVR, PDP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 36
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2021
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 792).
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2021
|
Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 790).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2021
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Moriwaki Chair; Rhoads, Wakai Co-Chairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2021
|
Senate disagrees with House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2021
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 505).
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2021
|
Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Ohno excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2021
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-13-21.
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2021
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1842) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2021
|
The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2021
|
Proposed draft of Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 04-07-21 1:30PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. Copy of proposed draft available at www.capitol.hawaii.gov.
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2021
|
Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2021
|
Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1467), recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2021
|
The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Har, Hashem, Kong, Mizuno, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 03-24-21 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2021
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2021
|
Reported from GVR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1078) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2021
|
The committees on GVR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Wildberger, Cullen, Mizuno, Woodson, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Eli, Ichiyama.
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by GVR on Wednesday, 03-17-21 10:00AM in House conference room 309 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
Referred to GVR, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 22
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 180) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Acasio. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2021
|
One Day Notice 03-09-21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2021
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 768) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2021
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2021
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-26-21 9:30AM; CR 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2021
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2021
|
Reported from GVO/JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 548) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2021
|
The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Moriwaki, Dela Cruz, Chang, Gabbard, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2021
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Gabbard, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Acasio ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kim.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2021
|
The committee(s) on GVO/JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-16-21 3:00PM; 016 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2021
|
Re-Referred to GVO/JDC, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2021
|
Referred to GVO, JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2021
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2021
|
Introduced.
|
|
|