Senate
|
05/06/2022
|
Enrolled to Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2022
|
Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 824).
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2022
|
Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 946).
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2022
|
Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2022
|
Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2022
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-03-22.
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2022
|
Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 99-22) as amended in (CD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2022
|
48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2022
|
Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 99-22).
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2022
|
The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakamura, Kitagawa, Ilagan, Hashimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chang, Moriwaki, Misalucha, Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-22 5:30PM; CR 329.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-22 1:35PM; Conference Room 329.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2022
|
Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-25-22 2:08PM; Conference Room 329.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2022
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 729).
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2022
|
House Conferees Appointed: Nakamura, Kitagawa, Ilagan Co-Chairs; Hashimoto, McDermott.
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2022
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 880).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2022
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Chang Chair; Moriwaki, Misalucha Co-Chairs; Rhoads, Fevella.
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2022
|
Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 871).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2022
|
Senate disagrees with House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2022
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 627).
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2022
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2022
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1972-22), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2022
|
The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Branco, Eli, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Sayama, Tam, Todd, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Holt, Perruso, McDermott.
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 04-05-22 2:30PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2022
|
Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2022
|
Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1404-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2022
|
The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Har, Hashem, Kong, Mizuno, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 03-21-22 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2022
|
Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Branco, Ilagan, McKelvey, Ohno excused (4).
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2022
|
Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1125-22), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2022
|
The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakamura, Hashimoto, Aquino, Clark, Ilagan, Kitagawa, Takumi; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) LoPresti, McDermott.
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Thursday, 03-17-22 9:00AM in House conference room 423 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Referred to HSG, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 24
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 240).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
One Day Notice 03-08-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3057) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Misalucha, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani, Taniguchi, Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-03-22 10:10AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2022
|
Reported from HOU/GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2377) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2022
|
The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in GVO were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Moriwaki, Dela Cruz, Chang, Gabbard, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2022
|
The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HOU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chang, Kanuha, Moriwaki, Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2022
|
The committee(s) on HOU/GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-22 1:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2022
|
Re-Referred to HOU/GVO, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2022
|
Referred to HOU/GVO, CPN/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2022
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2022
|
Introduced.
|
|
|