LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Hawaii HI
Legislatures
2022 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB2517
Action History
HI
Hawaii Senate Bill SB2517
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Hawaii 2022 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB2517
Action History
Senate
02/15/2022
The committee on TRS deferred the measure.
Senate
02/10/2022
The committee(s) on TRS deferred the measure until 02-15-22 3:35PM; Via Videoconference.
Senate
02/07/2022
The committee(s) on TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-22 3:00PM; Via Videoconference.
Senate
01/24/2022
Referred to TRS, WAM.
Senate
01/24/2022
Passed First Reading.
Senate
01/21/2022
Introduced.