Senate | 02/18/2022 | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WTL/WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/18/2022 | Reported from TRS/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2539) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WTL/WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/15/2022 | The committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Inouye, DeCoite, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro. | ||
Senate | 02/15/2022 | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, DeCoite, Baker, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
Senate | 02/09/2022 | The committee(s) on TRS/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-15-22 3:15PM; Via Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/24/2022 | Referred to TRS/PSM, WTL/WAM. | ||
Senate | 01/24/2022 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/21/2022 | Introduced. |