Senate | 02/18/2022 | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/18/2022 | Reported from EDU/AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2550) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Acasio, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Dela Cruz, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
Senate | 02/04/2022 | The committee(s) on EDU/AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-22 3:00PM; Conference Room 229 + videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/24/2022 | Referred to EDU/AEN, WAM. | ||
Senate | 01/24/2022 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/21/2022 | Introduced. |