|
12/10/2021
|
Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2021
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Wildberger voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2021
|
Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1370) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2021
|
The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Ilagan, DeCoite, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, Nakamura, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Takumi.
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2021
|
Bill re-scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 03-24-21 10:30AM in conference room 423 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 03-24-21 11:00AM in House conference room 423 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2021
|
Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 16
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2021
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2021
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 19).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2021
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella, San Buenaventura . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Acasio). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) English, Ihara). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2021
|
One Day Notice 02-18-21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2021
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2021
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 293) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2021
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Taniguchi.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2021
|
The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-10-21 10:05AM in conference room 211.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2021
|
The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-21 10:00AM in conference room 211.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2021
|
Referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2021
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2021
|
Introduced.
|
|
|