Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-29-22 2:08PM; Conference Room 329.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-22 2:10PM; Conference Room 329.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-22 1:35PM; Conference Room 329.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2022
|
Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-25-22 2:08PM; Conference Room 329.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2022
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 729).
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2022
|
House Conferees Appointed: Nakamura, Tarnas, Ilagan Co-Chairs; Hashimoto, McDermott.
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2022
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 880).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2022
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Chang Chair; Taniguchi, Inouye Co-Chairs; Moriwaki, Fevella.
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2022
|
Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 866).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2022
|
Senate disagrees with House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2022
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 547).
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2022
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kapela, McKelvey, Quinlan excused (3). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2022
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1881-22), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2022
|
The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Branco, Eli, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Sayama, Tam, Todd, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Holt, Perruso, McDermott.
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 04-05-22 2:30PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2022
|
Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno, Quinlan excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2022
|
Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1298-22), recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2022
|
The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Branco, Ganaden, B. Kobayashi, Kong, Morikawa, Ohno; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Tuesday, 03-22-22 9:30AM in House conference room 430 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2022
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on WAL with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Branco, Ilagan, McKelvey, Ohno excused (4).
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2022
|
Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1124-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to WAL.
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2022
|
The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakamura, Hashimoto, Aquino, Clark, Ilagan, Kitagawa, Takumi; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) LoPresti, McDermott.
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Thursday, 03-17-22 9:00AM in House conference room 423 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Referred to HSG, WAL, FIN, referral sheet 24
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 256) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
Reported from WAM/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2795) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Keith-Agaran, Misalucha, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Misalucha, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Wakai.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2022
|
The committee(s) on WAM/WTL will hold a public decision making on 02-23-22 1:00PM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM/WTL.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
Reported from HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2476) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM/WTL.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2022
|
The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HOU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chang, Kanuha, Moriwaki, Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2022
|
The committee(s) on HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-15-22 1:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
Re-Referred to HOU, WAM/WTL.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2022
|
Referred to HOU/PSM, WAM/WTL.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2022
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2022
|
Introduced.
|
|
|