House
|
06/27/2022
|
Act 191, on 06/27/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1292).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2022
|
Act 191, 06/27/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1292).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2022
|
Enrolled to Governor.
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2022
|
Received notice of reconsideration, Senate agreement, and Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 888).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2022
|
Passed Final Reading. Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella . 1 No(es): Senator(s) Acasio. 1 Excused: Senator(s) Keohokalole.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2022
|
One Day Notice 04-21-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2022
|
Senate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Reading on 04-21-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2022
|
Reconsideration of action taken on 04-14-22 in disagreeing to the House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2022
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 729).
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2022
|
House Conferees Appointed: Nakamura, Tarnas, Nakashima, Ilagan Co-Chairs; Hashimoto, McDermott.
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2022
|
Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 871).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2022
|
Senate disagrees with House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2022
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 631).
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2022
|
Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela, Perruso voting no (2) and Representative(s) Lowen excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2022
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-12-22.
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2022
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1981-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2022
|
The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Todd, Wildberger, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 04-06-22 1:30PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2022
|
Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Perruso voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela voting no (1) and Representative(s) Ohno excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2022
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1348-22), recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2022
|
The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ward; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka.
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Monday, 03-21-22 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2022
|
Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with Representative(s) Kong voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ganaden, Kapela, Perruso voting no (3) and Representative(s) Branco, Ilagan, McKelvey, Ohno excused (4).
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2022
|
Reported from HSG/WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1163-22), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2022
|
The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Branco, Ganaden, B. Kobayashi, Morikawa, Ohno; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Kong; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2022
|
The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakamura, Hashimoto, Aquino, Clark, Ilagan, Kitagawa, Takumi; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) LoPresti, McDermott.
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2022
|
Bill re-scheduled to be heard by HSG/WAL on Thursday, 03-17-22 11:00AM in conference room 309 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG/WAL on Thursday, 03-17-22 11:00AM in House conference room 423 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Referred to HSG/WAL, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 24
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 257) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Acasio, Fevella. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Reported from WAM/JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3184) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Misalucha, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Gabbard, Kim, Lee; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Acasio, Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2022
|
The committee(s) on WAM/JDC will hold a public decision making on 03-02-22 9:30AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM/JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2022
|
Reported from HOU/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2536) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM/JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2022
|
The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Keith-Agaran, Misalucha, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2022
|
The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chang, Kanuha, Moriwaki, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
The committee(s) on HOU/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-22 1:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2022
|
Referred to HOU/WTL, WAM/JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2022
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2022
|
Introduced.
|
|
|