Senate | 02/14/2022 | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/14/2022 | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2274) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/08/2022 | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, DeCoite, Baker, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
Senate | 02/03/2022 | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-22 1:00PM; Via Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/24/2022 | Referred to PSM, WAM. | ||
Senate | 01/24/2022 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/21/2022 | Introduced. |