House
|
06/27/2022
|
Act 157, on 06/27/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1258).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2022
|
Act 157, 06/27/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1258).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2022
|
Enrolled to Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2022
|
Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 824).
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2022
|
Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 946).
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2022
|
Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2022
|
Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2022
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-03-22.
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2022
|
Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 239-22) as amended in (CD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2022
|
48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2022
|
Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 239-22).
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2022
|
The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Lowen, Johanson, Tam, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2022
|
The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Gabbard, Acasio, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-29-22 4:40PM; Conference Room 329.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-22 4:40PM; Conference Room 329.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2022
|
Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-27-22 4:45PM; Conference Room 329.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2022
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 729).
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2022
|
House Conferees Appointed: Yamane, Lowen, Johanson, Tam Co-Chairs; Ward.
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2022
|
Re-referred to HHH/EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 50
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2022
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 880).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2022
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Keohokalole Chair; Gabbard, Acasio, Wakai Co-Chairs; Fevella.
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2022
|
Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 871).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2022
|
Senate disagrees with House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2022
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 634).
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2022
|
Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2022
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-12-22.
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2022
|
Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1906-22) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2022
|
The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Har, Hashem, Kong, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Mizuno.
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 03-31-22 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kitagawa, Kong excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
Reported from HHH/EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1285-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2022
|
The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Marten, Hashem, Perruso, Todd, Tokioka, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Matayoshi.
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2022
|
The committees on HHH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Tam, Gates, Har, Kapela, Nishimoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HHH/EEP on Thursday, 03-17-22 11:00AM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Referred to HHH/EEP, CPC, referral sheet 24
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 262) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Reported from JDC/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2990) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Misalucha, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2022
|
The committee(s) on JDC/WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-02-22 9:30AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2022
|
Reported from HTH/AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2561) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2022
|
The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Acasio, Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2022
|
The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Baker, Moriwaki, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) San Buenaventura.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2022
|
The committee(s) on HTH/AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-22 1:00PM; Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2022
|
Referred to HTH/AEN, JDC/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2022
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2022
|
Introduced.
|
|
|