Hawaii 2022 2022 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB2600 Amended / Bill

Filed 04/08/2022

                    THE SENATE   S.B. NO.   2600     THIRTY-FIRST LEGISLATURE, 2022   S.D. 2     STATE OF HAWAII   H.D. 2                            A BILL FOR AN ACT     RELATING TO UNDERGROUND STORAGE TANKS.     BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF HAWAII:   

THE SENATE S.B. NO. 2600
THIRTY-FIRST LEGISLATURE, 2022 S.D. 2
STATE OF HAWAII H.D. 2

THE SENATE

S.B. NO.

2600

THIRTY-FIRST LEGISLATURE, 2022

S.D. 2

STATE OF HAWAII

H.D. 2

 

 

 

 

 

A BILL FOR AN ACT

 

 

RELATING TO UNDERGROUND STORAGE TANKS.

 

 

BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF HAWAII:

 

      SECTION 1.  Chapter 342L, Hawaii Revised Statutes, is amended by adding a new section to part I to be appropriately designated and to read as follows:      "§342L-     Large capacity underground storage tank systems; prohibited.  (a)  Beginning July 1, 2022, the department shall not issue a permit for a new large capacity underground storage tank system mauka of the underground injection control line.      (b)  Beginning January 1, 2023, no person shall operate a large capacity underground storage tank system mauka of the underground injection control line, and no permit for a large capacity underground storage tank system mauka of the underground injection control line shall be renewed.      (c)  As used in this section:      "Large capacity underground storage tank system" means an underground storage tank system with any single tank with a capacity greater than fifty thousand gallons or with a total tank capacity greater than one hundred thousand gallons.      "Underground injection control line" means the underground injection control line represented by a dashed line on the department of health underground injection control program maps, made effective July 6, 1984, pursuant to section 340E-2 and identified as follows:      (1)  For the island of Hawaii, quadrangles H-1 to H-74;      (2)  For the island of Kauai, quadrangles K-1 to K-11;      (3)  For the island of Lanai, quadrangles L-North and L‑South;      (4)  For the island of Maui, quadrangles M-1 to M-17;      (5)  For the island of Molokai, quadrangles M-East and M‑West; and      (6)  For the island of Oahu, quadrangles O-1 to O-15."      SECTION 2.  New statutory material is underscored.      SECTION 3.  This Act shall take effect July 1, 2060. 

     SECTION 1.  Chapter 342L, Hawaii Revised Statutes, is amended by adding a new section to part I to be appropriately designated and to read as follows:

     "§342L-     Large capacity underground storage tank systems; prohibited.  (a)  Beginning July 1, 2022, the department shall not issue a permit for a new large capacity underground storage tank system mauka of the underground injection control line.

     (b)  Beginning January 1, 2023, no person shall operate a large capacity underground storage tank system mauka of the underground injection control line, and no permit for a large capacity underground storage tank system mauka of the underground injection control line shall be renewed.

     (c)  As used in this section:

     "Large capacity underground storage tank system" means an underground storage tank system with any single tank with a capacity greater than fifty thousand gallons or with a total tank capacity greater than one hundred thousand gallons.

     "Underground injection control line" means the underground injection control line represented by a dashed line on the department of health underground injection control program maps, made effective July 6, 1984, pursuant to section 340E-2 and identified as follows:

     (1)  For the island of Hawaii, quadrangles H-1 to H-74;

     (2)  For the island of Kauai, quadrangles K-1 to K-11;

     (3)  For the island of Lanai, quadrangles L-North and L‑South;

     (4)  For the island of Maui, quadrangles M-1 to M-17;

     (5)  For the island of Molokai, quadrangles M-East and M‑West; and

     (6)  For the island of Oahu, quadrangles O-1 to O-15."

     SECTION 2.  New statutory material is underscored.

     SECTION 3.  This Act shall take effect July 1, 2060.

    Report Title: Large Capacity Underground Storage Tank Systems; Underground Injection Control Lines; Permits; Prohibition   Description: Beginning 7/1/2022, prohibits issuance of permits for future large capacity underground storage tank systems mauka of the underground injection control line.  Beginning 1/1/2023, prohibits operation of, and renewal of permits for, large capacity underground storage tank systems located mauka of the underground injection control line.  Effective 7/1/2060.  (HD2)       The summary description of legislation appearing on this page is for informational purposes only and is not legislation or evidence of legislative intent.         

 

Report Title:

Large Capacity Underground Storage Tank Systems; Underground Injection Control Lines; Permits; Prohibition

 

Description:

Beginning 7/1/2022, prohibits issuance of permits for future large capacity underground storage tank systems mauka of the underground injection control line.  Beginning 1/1/2023, prohibits operation of, and renewal of permits for, large capacity underground storage tank systems located mauka of the underground injection control line.  Effective 7/1/2060.  (HD2)

 

 

 

The summary description of legislation appearing on this page is for informational purposes only and is not legislation or evidence of legislative intent.