Senate | 02/08/2022 | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC/WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/08/2022 | Reported from HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2117) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC/WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/01/2022 | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HWN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Keohokalole, Acasio; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Fevella; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara. | ||
Senate | 01/27/2022 | The committee(s) on HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-22 1:01PM; Via Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/24/2022 | Referred to HWN, JDC/WAM. | ||
Senate | 01/24/2022 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/21/2022 | Introduced. |