House
|
03/18/2022
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Kapela, Perruso voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) D. Kobayashi voting no (1) and Representative(s) Branco, Ilagan, McKelvey, Ohno excused (4).
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2022
|
Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1134-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2022
|
The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Hashem, Perruso, Lowen, Marten, Matayoshi, Todd, Tokioka, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Wednesday, 03-16-22 10:00AM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Referred to AGR, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 24
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 269) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Acasio. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3080) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2022
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Misalucha, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2022
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-22-22 10:00AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2022
|
Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2296) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2022
|
The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Acasio ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2022
|
The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-22 1:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2022
|
Referred to AEN, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2022
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2022
|
Introduced.
|
|
|