House
|
06/27/2022
|
Notice of intent to veto (Gov. Msg. No. 1216)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2022
|
Notice of Intent to veto dated 06/27/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1216)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2022
|
Enrolled to Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2022
|
Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 824).
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2022
|
Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 946).
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2022
|
Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Eli, Kapela, Perruso voting no (3) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2022
|
Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2022
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-03-22.
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2022
|
Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 93-22) as amended in (CD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2022
|
48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2022
|
Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 93-22).
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Nishimoto, Matayoshi, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Keohokalole, DeCoite; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-22 1:31PM; Conference Room 325.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2022
|
Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-22 1:31PM; Conference Room 325.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-22 1:31PM; Conference Room 325.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2022
|
Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-25-22 1:31PM; Conference Room 325.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2022
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 729).
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2022
|
House Conferees Appointed: Nakashima, Nishimoto Co-Chairs; Matayoshi, Ward.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2022
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 873).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2022
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Shimabukuro Chair; Keohokalole Co-Chair; DeCoite, Fevella.
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2022
|
Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 871).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2022
|
Senate disagrees with House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2022
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 637).
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2022
|
Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Perruso voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Eli, Kapela, D. Kobayashi, Tam voting no (4) and Representative(s) Lowen excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2022
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-12-22.
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2022
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2018-22) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2022
|
The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Nishimoto, Sayama, Todd, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Marten; 3 Noes: Representative(s) Eli, Perruso, Tam; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Branco, McDermott.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 04-04-22 2:30PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Perruso voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kitagawa, Kong excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1269-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2022
|
The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, LoPresti, Lowen, Takumi, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Nakamura; 1 Noes: Representative(s) D. Kobayashi; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McKelvey.
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 03-15-22 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 24
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 270) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Acasio. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2949) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Acasio ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2022
|
The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 03-01-22 9:30AM; Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2022
|
Reported from HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2163) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2022
|
The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Keohokalole, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Acasio ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2022
|
The committee(s) on HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-22 1:01PM; Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2022
|
Referred to HWN, JDC .
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2022
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2022
|
Introduced.
|
|
|